Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission – Health Record and Payment Integration Program Advisory Committee
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to establish a Maryland Health Record and Payment Integration Program Advisory Committee to study the feasibility of creating a health record and payment integration program, certain approaches, and certain other issues for purposes of improving health care coordination; requiring the Commission to submit the findings and recommendations of the Advisory Committee to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {207678/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {456788/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Health - Health Record and Payment Clearinghouse - Pilot Program
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {207678/1 Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Text - Third - Maryland Health Care Commission – Health Record and Payment Integration Program Advisory Committee
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/04/2018 4/05/2018 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments {456788/1 Adopted 66
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Health Care Commission – Health Record and Payment Integration Program Advisory Committee
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Text - Chapter - Maryland Health Care Commission – Health Record and Payment Integration Program Advisory Committee
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM