Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley and Elfreth
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 734
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Maryland Department of Health from accepting certain funding under Title X of the federal Public Health Service Act if the Title X program excludes family planning providers and does not require family planning providers to provide a broad range of acceptable and effective medically approved family planning methods and services; and requiring the Governor to fund the Family Planning Program with a certain level of State funds under certain circumstances.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1272
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {853923/1 (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (28-16)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {153521/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (44-91)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-42)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 734
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable 54
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Kelley) Adopted 54
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Floor Amendment {853923/1 (Senator Kelley) Adopted 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 56
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Kelley) Adopted 57
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (28-16) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 60
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Floor Amendment {153521/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (44-91) 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (95-42) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 734
Text - Chapter - Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3401, 13-3402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM