Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Doulas - Doula Technical Assistance Advisory Group and Certification
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Carter, and Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Doula Technical Assistance Advisory Group; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Advisory Group; requiring the Advisory Group to study certain programs, review certain studies and reports, invite certain stakeholders to meetings, and make certain recommendations; requiring the Advisory Group to submit a final report to the Maryland Department of Health and certain committees of the General Assembly by January 1, 2022; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1067
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 4 of the bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Doulas - Doula Technical Assistance Advisory Group and Certification
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Doulas - Doula Technical Assistance Advisory Group and Certification
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/11/2020 3:07 PM