Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Land Use - Comprehensive Plans - Housing Element
Sponsored by
Senators Lam and Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 714
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the planning commissions for certain local jurisdictions to include a housing element in the comprehensive plan for their respective jurisdictions; requiring the housing element to address the need for affordable housing within the jurisdiction, including workforce housing and low-income housing; authorizing the housing element to include goals, objectives, policies, plans, and standards; and applying the Act prospectively.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1045
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Land Use - Comprehensive Plans - Housing Element
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {904639/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Land Use - Comprehensive Plans - Housing Element
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-40)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 714
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Land Use - Comprehensive Plans - Housing Element
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Land Use - Comprehensive Plans - Housing Element
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments {904639/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Text - Third - Land Use - Comprehensive Plans - Housing Element
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 65
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (96-40) 68
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 714
Text - Chapter - Land Use - Comprehensive Plans - Housing Element
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-406, 1-407.1, 3-102, 3-114 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM