Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health – Milk – Labeling
Sponsored by
Senators Gallion, Bailey, Hershey, and Jennings
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from stating on a label of a food product that the product is milk unless the product meets a certain definition; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to establish and implement a plan to enforce a certain prohibition, including notice of the Department's intent to implement a ban on all products that do not meet certain requirements; requiring the Department to track certain legislation and notify the Department of Legislative Services of a certain occurrence within a certain period of time; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0815
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agriculture - Milk and Milk-Based Products - Labeling
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {214231/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health – Milk – Labeling
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-10)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {650515/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {550919/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 04/06 (Delegate Stein) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {600717/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (118-21)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-10)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Health – Milk – Labeling
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Health – Milk – Labeling
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Agriculture - Milk and Milk-Based Products - Labeling
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {214231/1 Adopted 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Public Health – Milk – Labeling
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (36-10) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 50
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {650515/1 Adopted 63
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Floor Committee Amendment {550919/1 Adopted 64
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Motion Special Order until 04/06 (Delegate Stein) Adopted 64
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Floor Committee Amendment {600717/1 Adopted 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (118-21) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (36-10) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Health – Milk – Labeling
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Text - Chapter - Public Health – Milk – Labeling
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-401, 21-424 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM