Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Ethics - Issue Lobbying Communications - Lobbyist Registration and Disclosure Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Ellis, Guzzone, Kelley, Smith, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Kagan)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain entity to register with the State Ethics Commission as a regulated lobbyist if, during a certain reporting period, the entity spends a certain amount for issue lobbying communications; requiring a certain regulated lobbyist to report certain information to the Ethics Commission in addition to certain other reports; requiring a certain regulated lobbyist to report certain information to the Ethics Commission within a certain period of time on receipt of an aggregate donation of a certain amount; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0953
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614234/1
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614234/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Kagan) Adopted (30-15)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Ethics - Issue Lobbying Communications - Lobbyist Registration and Disclosure Requirements
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {614234/1 45
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {614234/1 46
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Committee Amendment Adopted 46
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 46
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Kagan) Adopted (30-15) 47A
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Kagan) Adopted 50
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-701, 5-702, 5-705, 5-717, 5-718 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:27 PM