Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsored by
Senators Stone, Kelley, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing to $43,000 the salary of each associate judge of the Orphans' Court for Baltimore County beginning July 1, 2014; increasing to $45,000 the salary of the Chief Judge of the Orphans' Court for Baltimore County beginning July 1, 2014; and providing that the Act does not apply to the salary or compensation of the judges of the Orphans' Court for Baltimore County during a specified term of office.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-6)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {722812/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-2)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2013 2/13/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (37-6) 59
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 60
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/06/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments {722812/1 Report Adopted 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-2) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM