Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

SB0931


CH0615

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs - Definition
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 615
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Secretary of Health from considering certain drugs to be specialty drugs for the purposes of providing services under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; altering the definition of "specialty drug" for the purpose of excluding prescription drugs prescribed to treat certain conditions from the authority of certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to require certain drugs be obtained through a certain pharmacy and to provide coverage through a managed care system; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0652
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {497676/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 615
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs - Definition
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {497676/1 Adopted 47
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs - Definition
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 49
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 52
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 615
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:33 PM