Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting certain defendants placed in private home detention as a condition of pretrial release from the requirement to pay a certain monitoring fee if the defendant qualifies as an indigent individual under certain circumstances or if a private home detention monitoring device is provided by the State or a local jurisdiction.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0566
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM