Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

SB0938


CH0489

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes, Hershey, Kelley, Feldman, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Jennings, Klausmeier, Kramer, and Reilly
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that the assessment of a fee by the State Health Services Cost Review Commission for funding the Hospital Employees Retraining Fund is to be in the case of a hospital closure, merger, or full delicensure; altering the circumstances under which hospitals are required to pay a certain fee directly to the Maryland Department of Labor; requiring certain hospitals to pay a direct remittance based on total annual revenue by July 1 each year; requiring that certain money be returned to certain hospitals under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1571
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {167875/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable with Amendments {167875/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 47
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 49B
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:19 PM