Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Services Initiative - Vision Care for Low-Income Children
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, under certain circumstances, to establish a certain Health Services Initiative; requiring the Health Services Initiative to apply to certain individuals, require certain schools to provide certain services, offer services from certain providers, and require the Department to reimburse certain providers in a certain manner for certain services; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1020
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Services Initiative - Vision Care for Low-Income Children
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Services Initiative - Vision Care for Low-Income Children
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/6/2020 1:04 PM