Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety (Safe Care Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring State residential centers and State-operated hospitals to develop a workplace safety plan; establishing certain requirements for a certain workplace safety plan; requiring that certain training address certain risks and include certain instruction on certain matters; requiring certain State residential centers and State-operated hospitals to collaborate with a certain committee for certain purposes; requiring that certain procedures include certain other procedures; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1568
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
49A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety (Safe Care Act)
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Adopted 48
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed 48
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety (Safe Care Act)
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 49
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Economic Matters 49A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:54 AM