Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Behavioral Health Programs – Outpatient Mental Health Centers – Medical Directors
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that regulations adopted under certain provisions of law regulating behavioral health programs include provisions authorizing a psychiatric nurse practitioner to serve as a medical director of a certain outpatient mental health center, including through telehealth.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {627874/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Behavioral Health Programs - Medical Directors - Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments {627874/1 Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Text - Third - Behavioral Health Programs – Outpatient Mental Health Centers – Medical Directors
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Text - Chapter - Behavioral Health Programs – Outpatient Mental Health Centers – Medical Directors
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM