Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Grant Program for Workforce Skills Assessment
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Grant Program for Workforce Skills Assessment in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation; providing that the purpose of the Program is to provide financial assistance to an employer for the administration of assessments that measure workplace or job-related skills of employees who are State residents; authorizing the Governor to include an annual appropriation to the Program in the State budget; requiring the Department to implement and administer the Program and adopt certain regulations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Grant Program for Workforce Skills Assessment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Grant Program for Workforce Skills Assessment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Grant Program for Workforce Skills Assessment
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed 56
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Grant Program for Workforce Skills Assessment
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 57
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 57
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Rereferred to Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM