Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Campaign Finance – Termination of Campaign Finance Entities
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing any remaining balance in the account of a certain campaign finance entity before its termination to be paid to a certain legislative party caucus committee; requiring the authorized candidate campaign committee of a candidate who dies to pay outstanding obligations, dispose of remaining funds in a certain manner, and terminate and file a final campaign finance report within 1 year after the candidate's death; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {964338/1
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {964338/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {403626/2 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {285867/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Campaign Finance – Termination of Campaign Finance Entities
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Campaign Finance – Termination of Campaign Finance Entities
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Campaign Finance - Death of Candidate - Termination of Campaign Committee
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments {964338/1 46A
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 46A
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {964338/1 Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Floor Amendment {403626/2 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Campaign Finance - Death of Candidate - Termination of Campaign Committee
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Ways and Means 50
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments {285867/1 Adopted 64
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Campaign Finance – Termination of Campaign Finance Entities
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491
Text - Chapter - Campaign Finance – Termination of Campaign Finance Entities
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-247, 13-310.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM