Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Recordation Tax – Collection by State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Distribution
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt and Ferguson
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the distribution of revenue from certain recordation taxes collected by the State Department of Assessments and Taxation; requiring the Comptroller, in consultation with the Department, to hire an independent certified public accountant to perform an audit of the distribution of certain recordation tax revenue; requiring that the audit be completed by July 1, 2019; requiring the Comptroller, under certain circumstances, to pay an amount due to a county that received an underpayment of recordation tax revenue; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tax - Property - Collateralization of Tax Lien Securities
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {899934/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {455166/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Ferguson, Kasemeyer and Eckardt)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Ferguson, Kasemeyer and Eckardt)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Walker, D. Barnes and Long)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Walker, D. Barnes and Long)
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Tax - Property - Collateralization of Tax Lien Securities
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 2:15 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {899934/1 Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62A
Text - Third - Recordation Tax – Collection by State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Distribution
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (43-1) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 62
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments {455166/1 Adopted 66
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Ferguson, Kasemeyer and Eckardt) 66
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Ferguson, Kasemeyer and Eckardt) 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Refuses Recede 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Walker, D. Barnes and Long) 69
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 House Refuses Recede 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Walker, D. Barnes and Long) 67
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM