Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Kent County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2019
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 768
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a holder of a Class D beer, wine, and liquor license in Kent County to sell alcoholic beverages for off-premises consumption as well as on-premises consumption; increasing to 15 the maximum number of rooms that a facility with a Class B (country inn) beer, wine, and liquor license may offer to the public as sleeping accommodations; decreasing to 100 the minimum number of permanently installed seats required in a theater with a theater beer, wine, and liquor license; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1335
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Kent County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Kent County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 768
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Kent County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Kent County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2019
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Kent County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2019
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 46A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Economic Matters 46A
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Hearing canceled
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 768
Text - Chapter - Kent County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2019
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-1002, 24-1004, 24-102, 24-904 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM