Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation - County, Municipal Corporation, or County Board Retirees
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey and Edwards
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing certain retired employees of a county, municipal corporation, or county board to participate in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits program under certain circumstances; and requiring the governing body of a county, municipal corporation, or county board to pay certain costs and to make certain determinations with regard to certain retirees under certain circumstances.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0602
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 8:30 a.m.
Text - First - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation - County, Municipal Corporation, or County Board Retirees
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:28 PM