Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Ground Leases - Past Due Ground Rent
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that a ground lease holder may not bring any suit, action, or proceeding against the current leasehold tenant or a former leasehold tenant to recover the ground rent that was due and owing before the date the current leasehold tenant acquired title to the leasehold interest if the ground lease was not registered in accordance with certain law prior to the date the current leasehold tenant acquired title, notwithstanding any other provision of law.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0753
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Ground Leases - Past Due Ground Rent
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Real Property - Ground Leases - Past Due Ground Rent
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-707, 8-806 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM