Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Imitation Firearms - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senators Washington, Carter, Hayes, and McCray
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting the sale and display of certain imitation firearms in Baltimore City; and providing that a certain violation is a civil offense subject to a fine of $500 for the first offense and $1,500 for each subsequent offense.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1160
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Imitation Firearms - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City - Imitation Firearms - Prohibition
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-111 )
Last Updated: 3/9/2020 7:55 PM