Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Investment Program – Work Activity Requirement – Authorized Activities and Report
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Services to allow an applicant for or recipient of assistance under the Family Investment Program to meet a work activity requirement by participating in a minimum of 20 hours per week of vocational educational training that leads to an associate degree, a diploma, or a certificate or an average of at least 20 hours per weeks of education directly related to employment; requiring the Department to report certain information to the General Assembly by October 1 each year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Opposite:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1066
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {797475/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Family Investment Program - Transitional Assistance for Education Pilot Program
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {797475/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Text - Third - Family Investment Program – Work Activity Requirement – Authorized Activities and Report
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 66
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Rereferred to Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 68
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 5-308, 5-322 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM