Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Tolls - Collection
Sponsored by
Senator Manno
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 547
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that the Maryland Transportation Authority may refer certain unpaid video tolls and associated civil penalties to the Central Collection Unit for collection; authorizing the Authority to recall certain unpaid video tolls and associated civil penalties from the Central Collection Unit under certain circumstances; establishing that the Central Collection Unit may not collect certain unpaid video tolls and associated civil penalties under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0963 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Tolls - Collection
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Tolls - Collection
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {680915/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {403726/1 (Delegate Jameson) Rejected
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Mathias, Klausmeier and Hershey)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Mathias, Klausmeier and Hershey)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Motion Recede (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 547
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Tolls - Collection
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Tolls - Collection
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed 45
Text - Third - Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Tolls - Collection
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 47
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 46
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {680915/1 Adopted 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Floor Amendment {403726/1 (Delegate Jameson) Rejected 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Mathias, Klausmeier and Hershey) 65
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Mathias, Klausmeier and Hershey) 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Motion Recede (Delegate Barve) Adopted 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Recede 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 68
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 547
Text - Chapter - Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Tolls - Collection
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1414 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM