Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Industrial Partnerships - Sustainable Materials Management Program - Established
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Industrial Partnerships Program to enter into a certain memorandum of understanding with certain agencies to establish a Sustainable Materials Management Program; requiring the Governor to appropriate a certain amount in certain fiscal years to the Maryland Technology Development Corporation for a certain program; requiring the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to distribute certain funds to the Maryland Industrial Partnerships Program; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Text - First - Industrial Partnerships - Sustainable Materials Management Program - Established
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-119 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:29 PM