Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup to Study Long-Term Care Medicaid Eligibility and Payments to Providers
Sponsored by
Senators Washington and Salling
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup to Study Long-Term Care Medicaid Eligibility and Payments to Providers; providing for the composition, cochairs, and staffing of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Workgroup to submit an interim and a final report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020, and June 30, 2021, respectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0977
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Workgroup to Study Long-Term Care Medicaid Eligibility and Payments to Providers
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/2/2020 9:40 AM