Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering from 1 year to 2 years, the number of years before the end of the term of a video lottery operation license that a licensee may apply for renewal of the license; providing for a 10-year term for a renewed license; requiring the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to renew a certain license unless the Commission finds the licensee is no longer qualified; requiring the Commission, before denying an application, to provide a licensee an opportunity for a hearing; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Senate 3/08/2019 3/11/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Adopted 59A
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed 59A
Text - Third - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 60
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1A-13, 9-1A-17 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM