Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Hettleman and Lee
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which certain entities are required to provide coverage for certain expenses arising from in vitro fertilization procedures; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0781
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {397173/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
42A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-29)
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Revisions
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Favorable with Amendments {397173/1 Adopted 39
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Text - Third - Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Revisions
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 41
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 42A
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (102-29) 49B
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:30 AM