Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Contracts and Purchases
Sponsored by
Carroll County Senators
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing to $35,000 the cost of a public work or improvement or the purchase price of supplies or equipment for which the County Commissioners of Carroll County may enter into a contract; requiring that when the cost of a public work or improvement or the purchase price of supplies or equipment in Carroll County exceeds $35,000 under certain conditions, the Chief of the Bureau of Purchasing for the County Commissioners shall advertise for bids for a certain amount of time in a media accessible to the general public; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0610
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Carroll County - Contracts and Purchases
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {434633/1
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {434633/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {434633/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {973723/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Carroll County - Contracts and Purchases
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Ready) Adopted 20
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 20
Text - First - Carroll County - Contracts and Purchases
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {434633/1 45
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {434633/1 46
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Ready) Adopted 46
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {434633/1 Adopted 47A
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Floor Amendment {973723/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted 47A
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Carroll County - Contracts and Purchases
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:51 AM