Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License - Movie Theaters
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Prince George's County Board of License Commissioners to issue a Class BLX (on-premises) beer, wine, and liquor license for use in a movie theater with average daily receipts from the sale of food, excluding candy and popcorn, that exceed the average daily receipts from the sale of alcoholic beverages; establishing a $2,000,000 investment requirement for a license applicant if the movie theater is located in a specified area; establishing the hours for sale under the Class BLX movie theater license; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1266
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {564438/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License - Movie Theaters
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {564438/1 Adopted 46A
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46A
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License - Movie Theaters
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 48
House 3/22/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-102, 26-1606, 26-1616, 26-2004 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM