Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - University System of Maryland)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Approving specified projects for the acquisition, development, and improvement of specified academic facilities for the University System of Maryland; authorizing the University System of Maryland to issue bonds in a total principal amount of $17,000,000 to finance and refinance specified renewal projects; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0821
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/25 (Senator DeGrange) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-5)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2014 2/12/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 24
Senate 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable 51
Senate 3/24/2014 3/17/2014 Special Order until 3/25 (Senator DeGrange) Adopted 51
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 53
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 First Reading Appropriations 57
House 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (128-5) 66
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM