Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Protective Orders - Notification of Service - Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Senator Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending to the end of December 31, 2016, the termination date of provisions of law that provide for notice of service on a respondent of specified protective orders.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {608171/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2013 2/20/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {608171/1 Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 52
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Judiciary 55A
House 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 64
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2009, 2011 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM