Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization
Sponsored by
Senators Jennings and Manno
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-1)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing an individual who is at least 21 years of age to conduct a bingo game involving cash prizes if the game is conducted at a specified senior citizen activities center in a specified manner.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {379737/1
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {379737/1
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/10 (Senator Manno) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {379737/1 (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Manno) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {379737/1
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Manno) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {379737/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Substitute Committee Amendment {349631/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {649536/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {505968/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
70
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {379737/1 38
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 38
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {379737/1 39
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/10 (Senator Manno) Adopted 39
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments {379737/1 (Budget and Taxation Committee) 41
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Manno) Adopted 41
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {379737/1 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Manno) Adopted 43
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {379737/1 Withdrawn 44
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Substitute Committee Amendment {349631/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 44
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Floor Committee Amendment {649536/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Referred Ways and Means 48
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable with Amendments {505968/1 Adopted 69
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 70
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-513 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM