Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Criminal History Records Check - Fire Departments, Rescue Squads, and Ambulance Services
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a fire department, a rescue squad, or an ambulance service from conducting a criminal history records check or requiring an applicant to disclose criminal records before the applicant's first in-person interview; requiring each fire department, rescue squad, and ambulance service to establish a certain peer review committee; and establishing the duties of a peer review committee.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0586
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Safety - Criminal History Records Check - Fire Departments, Rescue Squads, and Ambulance Services
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 6/10/2020 2:31 PM