Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cecil County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsored by
Cecil County Senators
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the length of time a school bus may be operated in Cecil County from 12 years to 15 years.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1171
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2013 2/21/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 59
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 60
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-804 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM