Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George’s County – Public School Construction – Prince George’s County Public–Private Partnership Fund
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting certain public school construction projects that use alternative financing methods and that receive State funding from certain requirements; requiring public school construction projects in Prince George's County that use alternative financing methods and that receive State funding to comply with certain requirements and a certain memorandum of understanding; establishing the Prince George's County Public-Private Partnership Fund to provide funds to pay certain entities for certain payments due; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1402
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
35A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
35A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {919037/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Peters) Adopted (45-0)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {224366/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Jackson) Adopted (134-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Peters) Adopted 35A
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 35A
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Prince George's County - Public School Construction - Prince George's County Alternative Financing Fund
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {919037/1 Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62A
Text - Third - Prince George’s County – Public School Construction – Prince George’s County Public–Private Partnership Fund
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Peters) Adopted (45-0) 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62A
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 64
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Rereferred to Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments {224366/1 Adopted 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Jackson) Adopted (134-0) 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 68
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Prince George’s County – Public School Construction – Prince George’s County Public–Private Partnership Fund
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Text - Chapter - Prince George’s County – Public School Construction – Prince George’s County Public–Private Partnership Fund
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-126, 4-126.1, 5-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM