Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Death Certificates - Completion and Cause of Death Report
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a physician designated by the State Anatomy Board to complete a certificate of death under certain circumstances; requiring a certain physician to enter certain information in a certain section of a death certificate; and requiring the State Anatomy Board to send to the Secretary of Health a report of the cause of death for entry on a certain death certificate if the State Anatomy Board receives information about the cause of death from certain individuals.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1400
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Health - Death Certificates - Completion and Cause of Death Report
Senate 3/05/2019 3/06/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable Adopted 50
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Second Reading Passed 50
Text - Third - Public Health - Death Certificates - Completion and Cause of Death Report
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 52
House 3/26/2019 3/27/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Veto sustained (0-46)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM