Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - New Homes - Correction of Drainage Defects PG 408-19
Sponsored by
Senators Patterson, Benson, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the governing body of Prince George's County to establish a program for the correction of drainage defects in new homes in the county; requiring the program to include certain claims and evaluation procedures; requiring the county to arrange to complete the correction and seek reimbursement from the homebuilder under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0219
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Prince George's County - New Homes - Correction of Drainage Defects PG 408-19
Senate 3/05/2019 3/06/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM