Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education; providing the purpose of the Task Force is to study policies and procedures related to the treatment of mental illness in students, and review certain best practices and models for accessing certain mental health services; requiring the Task Force to make certain recommendations on certain matters; requiring the Task Force to submit an interim report by December 1, 2020, and a final report by December 1, 2021, to certain committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1504
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/4/2020 9:45 AM