Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Architectural Services and Engineering Services - Reciprocal Preference
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a unit to give a certain preference under certain circumstances to a certain resident firm that is licensed or otherwise authorized to provide architectural services or engineering services in the State; requiring a certain nonresident firm to submit certain documentation concerning certain preferences to a unit at the request of the unit; requiring a unit to apply certain preferences to certain proposals in a certain manner; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1557
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Procurement - Architectural Services and Engineering Services - Reciprocal Preference
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable Adopted 42
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Second Reading Passed 42
Text - Third - Procurement - Architectural Services and Engineering Services - Reciprocal Preference
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 44
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Text - Chapter - Procurement - Architectural Services and Engineering Services - Reciprocal Preference
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 14-401, 14-401.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM