Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Campaign Finance - Out-of-State Political Committees
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam and Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which an out-of-state political committee is required to register with the State Board of Elections; requiring an out-of-state political committee to pay a registration fee of $500; altering the contents of certain reports that an out-of-state political committee must file; altering the sanctions imposed on an out-of-state political committee for failure to file certain reports; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Campaign Finance - Out-of-State Political Committees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Campaign Finance - Out-of-State Political Committees
Senate 3/05/2019 3/06/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM