Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Abuse and Neglect of Vulnerable Adults - Notice of Report
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier (By Request)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a copy of a report of alleged abuse or neglect of a vulnerable adult made to a State or local unit to be provided by the State or local unit to the individual alleged to have committed the abuse or neglect via certified mail or some other means reasonably calculated to provide actual notice.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Criminal Law - Abuse and Neglect of Vulnerable Adults - Notice of Report
Senate 3/08/2019 3/11/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-606 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM