Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Balancing the State Budget
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe, Elfreth, Griffith, Guzzone, King, Peters, and Zucker
Status
Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 645
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution authorizing the General Assembly to increase or add Executive Department items in the budget bill, provided that the total of the appropriation for the Executive Department approved by the General Assembly does not exceed the total proposed appropriation for the Executive Department submitted by the Governor; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State at the next general election to be held in November 2020 for adoption or rejection; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Committee Testimony
Details
Constitutional Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0990 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Balancing the State Budget
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {289032/1
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {289032/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {319238/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Balancing the State Budget
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-15)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {763328/1 (Delegate Kipke)
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Delegate Kipke)
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Delegate Kipke) Withdrawn
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {763328/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (38-97)
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {403426/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (40-95)
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (97-38)
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-39)
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 645
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Balancing the State Budget
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Balancing the State Budget
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {289032/1 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {289032/1 Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Floor Amendment {319238/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51A
Text - Third - Balancing the State Budget
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (30-15) 52
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Appropriations 51
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 9:30 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Adopted 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Floor Amendment {763328/1 (Delegate Kipke) 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Motion Laid Over (Delegate Kipke) 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Motion Laid Over (Delegate Kipke) Withdrawn 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Floor Amendment {763328/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (38-97) 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Floor Amendment {403426/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (40-95) 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Second Reading Passed 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (97-38) 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (95-39) 52A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 645
Text - Chapter - Balancing the State Budget
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:31 PM