Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Rural Public Institutions of Higher Education - Nurse Practitioner and Physician Assistant Students - Recruitment
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey and Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each public institution of higher education located in a rural area of the State to develop and implement a program to recruit nurse practitioner and physician assistant students; requiring the program to include an implementation strategy and a certain timeline; requiring each institution to submit a program summary to its governing body on or before July 1 each year; and requiring each governing body to submit a progress report to the Maryland Higher Education Commission on or before September 1 each year.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Rural Public Institutions of Higher Education - Nurse Practitioner and Physician Assistant Students - Recruitment
Senate 3/08/2019 3/11/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-405.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM