Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition
Sponsored by
Senator Hough
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the composition of a scenic river advisory board in Frederick County if the scenic or wild river for which the board was created flows through Frederick County and one or more other counties.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0917
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed 47
Text - Third - Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 50
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Text - Chapter - Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM