Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Sampling or Tasting
Sponsored by
Senators Brinkley and Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified restriction on the number of bottles of wine that may remain open at any one time at a wine sampling or tasting event in Frederick County; prohibiting a single individual at a wine sampling or tasting event in the county from consuming more than 6 ounces of wine from all brands in a single day; and requiring the Board to adopt specified regulations.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1386
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2014 3/19/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Second Reading Passed 48
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 49
House 3/21/2014 3/18/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM