Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Family Caregiver Reimbursement
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier (By Request)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a certain family caregiver to bring a civil action against a family member for reimbursement of reasonable expenses incurred to provide care and support to a family member in need against the family member in need or another family member; requiring an initial complaint filed in the civil action to include evidence of the expenses for which reimbursement is sought; and requiring the civil action to be filed within 10 years after the date on which the expenses are incurred.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Civil Actions - Family Caregiver Reimbursement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Civil Actions - Family Caregiver Reimbursement
Senate 3/08/2019 3/11/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-2201 through 3-2203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM