Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Uniform Citizen Complaint Process (Anton's Law)
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a certain uniform citizen complaint process require a complainant to be provided with a copy of the investigatory file relating to the complaint and copies of any prior complaints filed against a certain police officer.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1011
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Uniform Citizen Complaint Process (Anton's Law)
Senate 3/14/2019 3/15/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-202, 3-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM