Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Teacher Certification – Montessori Schools
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making an individual eligible for a certificate to teach students in a Montessori school if the individual meets certain requirements; authorizing the State Board of Education to require an individual to successfully pass an examination to be certified under the Act; providing that, subject to a certain exception, an individual that satisfies the requirements under the Act may not be required to meet any additional requirements to be certified to teach students at a Montessori school; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1002
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education – Teacher Certification – Montessori Schools
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Education – Teacher Certification – Montessori Schools
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-123 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM