Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Identifying Information
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Executive Director of the Social Services Administration to provide the Secretary of Health with identifying information regarding an individual who has had the individual's parental rights terminated under a certain provision of law and who has been suspected of abuse or neglect; and requiring the Department of Human Services to report by December 1, 2021, to the Governor and the General Assembly on the implementation of a plan by the State to search other state databases to identify persons responsible for abuse and neglect.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0887
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Identifying Information
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Identifying Information
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-715 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:32 PM