Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Inactive Status
Sponsored by
Senator Getty
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, under specified circumstances, a specified candidate or a specified treasurer to file an affidavit with the State Board of Elections requesting that the State Board place a specified campaign finance entity on inactive status; requiring, under specified circumstances, the State Board to place a campaign finance entity on inactive status; prohibiting, except under specified circumstances, a campaign finance entity on inactive status from making contributions or expenditures under specified provisions of law; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 13-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM