Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gas Price Clarity Act of 2018
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the information about a certain measurement of certain gasoline that must be stated on a sign on the premises of a retail service station dealer to require the highest price, or the cash price and the credit price, be stated in a clear and visible manner; authorizing a certain sign to state the highest price for a certain measurement of certain other motor fuel products; and repealing a certain exemption from a certain signage requirement for certain retail service station dealers.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0847 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Gas Price Clarity Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Gas Price Clarity Act of 2018
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Unfavorable Report by Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM